U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20347
  • Case Name: Maria Carmen Gagnon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.