U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02006
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Piampiano, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Es v. Richard Cubin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • August 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • August 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Entry of Default]
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Show Cause]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.