U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10366
  • Case Name: Brian S Kushniroff and Amanda S Kushniroff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 12 Confirmation]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Order to Comply]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.