U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00297
  • Case Name: GROSS v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2019
  • February 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.