U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20357
  • Case Name: Timothy B. Estes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
August, 2018
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or strip Lien]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.