U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10372
  • Case Name: Jennifer Lynn Pyles
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.