U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02007
  • Case Name: Jeffrey T. Piampiano, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the v. Ice Management, LLC f/k/a Lakewood Ice Rink, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Show Cause]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [More Definite Statement]
  • October 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • October 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [More Definite Statement]
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 08, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.