U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01006
  • Case Name: Hull, Esq. v. Greer et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Held]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Set]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay ]
October, 2018
  • October 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amend]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amend]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Document]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Entry]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 19, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • July 06, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Supplemental Document]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.