U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00218
  • Case Name: COPAN ITALIA SPA et al v. PURITAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.