U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10383
  • Case Name: Chad Bruce Bowman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.