U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02009
  • Case Name: Jeffrey T. Piampiano, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the v. Leddy et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Show Cause]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
  • September 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.