U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00258
  • Case Name: ENERCON v. FLEXTRONICS INTERNATIONAL USA INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.