U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00257
  • Case Name: GANTS v. PROBST ELECTRIC INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.