U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00170
  • Case Name: US EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. WAL-MART STORES INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Confidentiality Order]
  • September 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.