U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00173
  • Case Name: BROWN LUMBER AND BUILDING SUPPLY INC v. BLUETARP FINANCIAL INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.