U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02010
  • Case Name: Jeffrey T. Piampiano, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the v. Hillside Lumber Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • August 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.