U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00175
  • Case Name: US EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment - Consent Decree]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.