U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00255
  • Case Name: WILBUR v. FITZPATRICK et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2018
  • July 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.