U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01007
  • Case Name: Hull v. Getchell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Held]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Set]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Consent]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay ]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amend]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 26, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Objection]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amend]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • October 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • October 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Objection]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • August 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 01, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.