U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01008
  • Case Name: Bowder v. Decesere
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay ]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Show Cause]
  • September 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Entry]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.