U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00259
  • Case Name: MR AND MRS DOE v. CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DEPARTMENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order-IDEA Cases]
  • September 23, 2018: [Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: IDEA Initial Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.