U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00105
  • Case Name: CHARRON v. COUNTY OF YORK et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Bill of Costs]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.