U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20374
  • Case Name: LeighAnn Garcia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Dismissing Case]
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objecting to Discharge]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Motion Objecting to Discharge]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Matrix]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Repeat Filer]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.