U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10388
  • Case Name: Steven W Savoy, Sr and Laurie A Savoy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.