U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00189
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA v. O'LOUGHLIN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.