U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00263
  • Case Name: VAN DYKE v. TOWN OF DEXTER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 06, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.