U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00073
  • Case Name: FRENCH v. MERRILL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.