U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20377
  • Case Name: Linda K Douglass
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharge]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Application for Compensation]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Discharge]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Vacating Order]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Objection to Claim of Exempt Property]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Entry]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.