U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00266
  • Case Name: BELLAVANCE v. LIBERTY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.