U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00345
  • Case Name: HOOKER v. UNITED STATES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.