U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00216
  • Case Name: EDWARDS v. REM TRANSPORT LTD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.