U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00209
  • Case Name: TRAHAN v. WAYFAIR MAINE LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Bill of Costs]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.