U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00275
  • Case Name: GLADU v. WALTZ et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Objection]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order for Service]
  • August 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.