U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00268
  • Case Name: GLADU v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.