U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00288
  • Case Name: SMITH v. FITZPATRICK et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.