U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00256
  • Case Name: ROCQUE et al v. ZETTY LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Kepreos Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Objection]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.