U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00262
  • Case Name: WHEELING & LAKE ERIE RAILWAY COMPANY v. KEACH
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.