U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00293
  • Case Name: TODDLE INN FRANCHISING LLC v. KPJ ASSOCIATES LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Writ Issued]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Writ Issued]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Objection]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.