U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00298
  • Case Name: CITY OF BANGOR v. PURDUE PHARMA LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [MDL Certified Transfer Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [MDL Conditional Transfer Order]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.