U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00284
  • Case Name: STEVENS v. HP INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.