U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10479
  • Case Name: Devon W. Delong and Bobbie-Jo R. Cote
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.