U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00184
  • Case Name: PATRIOT INSURANCE COMPANY v. SCHUMACHER ELECTRIC CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.