U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00242
  • Case Name: MAINE WINDJAMMERS INC v. SEA3 LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.