U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00331
  • Case Name: ENDICOTT et al v. MARCUS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.