U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00253
  • Case Name: MARCUS v. ALLIED WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Objection]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.