U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10509
  • Case Name: Timothy R. Engel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.