U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 11-11043
  • Case Name: Robert Patrick Roy, Sr. and Shirley Ann Roy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Avoid or strip Lien]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Memorandum]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Order on Document]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Change of Address]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Entry]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Hearing Set]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Matrix]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Hearing Set]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haenn, Michael S. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.