U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10517
  • Case Name: Carol K Leavitt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • February 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.