U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00316
  • Case Name: PERKINS v. CIANBRO CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.