U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00365
  • Case Name: MESERVE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.